This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 03:31:28 (UTC).

ISRAEL AGAMYAN VS TRANSPORT ASSIST

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 ISRAEL AGAMYAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TRANSPORT ASSIST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4131

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGAMYAN ISRAEL

Defendant

TRANSPORT ASSIST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YEREMIAN DAVID HARMIK

SHKODNIK ROMAN

Defendant Attorneys

CALDWELL SUSAN LAUREN

BROOKS KIMBERLY N.

SLATER JARED WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

2/25/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

3/2/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance

2/5/2021: Notice of Appearance

Status Conference Statement - NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2021: Status Conference Statement - NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/21/2021: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

1/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/28/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/01/2021

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/01/2021

Initial Status Conference Order

12/3/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 12/03/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 12/03/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint); Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff); Transport Assist (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff); Transport Assist (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continued Initial Status Conference; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Initial Status Statement in Advance of Initial Status Conference; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:46 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 12/03/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Israel Agamyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHKODNIK ROMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEREMIAN, DAVID