This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 21:02:51 (UTC).

ISMAEL SOLIS VS JOSEPH F. COYNE, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 ISMAEL SOLIS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JOSEPH F COYNE, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8166

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLIS ISMAEL

Defendants

COYNE MELINDA W.

COYNE JOSEPH F. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOSTER RICHARD MARTIN

FOSTER RICHARD M.

Defendant Attorney

STEINBERG ANDREW H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

4/4/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 03/09/2022

3/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 03/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

3/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/31/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 28; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Order Continuing Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Informal Discovery Conference) of 03/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Informal Discovery Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Joseph F. Coyne, Jr. (Defendant); Melinda W. Coyne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joseph F. Coyne, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ismael Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSTER RICHARD MARTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSTER RICHARD M. ESQ.