This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 15:11:45 (UTC).

ISMAEL JUNIOR GARCIA VS ADAM CEASAR CASILLAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 ISMAEL JUNIOR GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADAM CEASAR CASILLAS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1108

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ISMAEL JUNIOR

Defendants

CABALLERO TRANSPORTATION LLC

CASILLAS ADAM CEASAR

RODRIGUEZ JEANETTE FLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON BENJAMIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

12/30/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2024
  • Hearing12/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ISMAEL JUNIOR GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: ADAM CEASAR CASILLAS (Defendant); JEANETTE FLORES RODRIGUEZ (Defendant); CABALLERO TRANSPORTATION LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ISMAEL JUNIOR GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: ADAM CEASAR CASILLAS (Defendant); JEANETTE FLORES RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ISMAEL JUNIOR GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: ADAM CEASAR CASILLAS (Defendant); JEANETTE FLORES RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less