This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 02:23:49 (UTC).

ISMAEL FRANCISCO VS UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 ISMAEL FRANCISCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, SAMANTHA JESSNER, BARBARA A. MEIERS, DAVID J. COWAN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3493

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

SAMANTHA JESSNER

BARBARA A. MEIERS

DAVID J. COWAN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCO ISMAEL

Defendant

UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC. DBA UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAJARIAN SAHAG II

BRADLEY MARCUS JOSEPH

KING LIRIT ARIELLA

Defendant Attorney

COOPER JAMES SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

3/1/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/22/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/1/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/09/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

11/19/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

11/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 11/24/2020

11/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 11/24/2020

Notice of Appearance

10/20/2020: Notice of Appearance

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

11/17/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 4:50 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Ismael Francisco (Plaintiff); United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by United Convalescent Facilities, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 2:37 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 09/14/2020, Initial Status Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ismael Francisco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ismael Francisco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC. DBA UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER JAMES SHERMAN