This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 08:07:54 (UTC).

ISHMAEL TEMPLE VS ODELL BECKHAM JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 ISHMAEL TEMPLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ODELL BECKHAM JR ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1287

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPLE ISHMAEL

Defendants

PURYEAR CHARLES J.

CHEFRLI

NFL PROPERTIES INC

BECKHAM JR. ODELL

GOODELL ROGER

THOMAS TALON

NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE

NFL PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL KONGNYUY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 04/05/2021

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 04/05/2021

Order - Dismissal

4/5/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/30/2020

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/2/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

2/21/2020: Notice of Related Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS ROGER GOODELLS, AS COMMISSIONER OF THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUES, AND NFL PROPERTIES, LLCS CCP 430.41 DECLARATION (VIA ADAM E. WAGME

2/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS ROGER GOODELLS, AS COMMISSIONER OF THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUES, AND NFL PROPERTIES, LLCS CCP 430.41 DECLARATION (VIA ADAM E. WAGME

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED DEADLINES

3/30/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED DEADLINES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/5/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/15/2020

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/15/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/11/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Named Defendants) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...) of 04/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 12/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by NFL PROPERTIES LLC (Defendant); ROGER GOODELL (Defendant); NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DEFENDANTS ROGER GOODELL?S, AS COMMISSIONER OF THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE?S, AND NFL PROPERTIES, LLC?S CCP 430.41 DECLARATION (VIA ADAM E. WAGMEISTER, ESQ.) RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by NFL PROPERTIES LLC (Defendant); ROGER GOODELL (Defendant); NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff); ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISHMAEL TEMPLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less