This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 03:58:27 (UTC).

ISAVEL CARRILLO VS KAREN GRIGORYAN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 ISAVEL CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KAREN GRIGORYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1098

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO ISAVEL

Defendant

GRIGORYAN KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSHAN F. ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/29/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2024
  • Hearing06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ISAVEL CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ISAVEL CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISAVEL CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOUSHAN F. ANTHONY