This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 20:11:28 (UTC).

ISAIAS VALERIO VS OSCAR GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 ISAIAS VALERIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7961

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALERIO ISAIAS

Defendants

GOMEZ OSCAR

BRUNDAGE BONE CONCRETE PUMPING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAYED BILL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/20/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/20/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 04/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ISAIAS VALERIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISAIAS VALERIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ISAIAS VALERIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BILL J. SAYED - BILL J SAYED ESQ