This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 16:24:05 (UTC).

ISAIAS MIXCO TEJADA VS SUNSET PLAZA INVESTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 ISAIAS MIXCO TEJADA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUNSET PLAZA INVESTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7809

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEJADA ISAIAS MIXCO

Defendants

BALSHEM EFIM BERCOVICH

PAKRAVAN DANNY

SUNSET PLAZA INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRADEMARK CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. DBA J.M.W. TRUSS AND COMPONENTS AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SUNSET PLAZA INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

NEW CENTURY BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS INC A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCANN SHAWN J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HUA RAYMOND H.

ERIKSON DAVID ALDEN

Cross Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN JOHN T

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/16/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

8/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/11/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2024
  • Hearing05/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NEW CENTURY BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS, INC, a California Domestic Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunset Plaza Investors, LLC, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sunset Plaza Investors, LLC, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sunset Plaza Investors, LLC, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sunset Plaza Investors, LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); Danny Pakravan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Efim Bercovich Balshem (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Isaias Mixco Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW CENTURY BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADEMARK CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN JOHN T.