This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 16:32:13 (UTC).

ISABELLE HILL VS BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 ISABELLE HILL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0876

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL ISABELLE

Defendants

BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC.

BEST WESTERN PLUS DESERT POPPY INN

DOE LEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2024
  • Hearing11/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Hearing12/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ISABELLE HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ISABELLE HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISABELLE HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N