This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 09:33:41 (UTC).

ISABEL MARQUEZ VS R.A. PHILLIPS INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 ISABEL MARQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against R A PHILLIPS INDUSTRIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0280

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARQUEZ ISABEL FKA MARIA MARQUEZ

Defendant

R.A. PHILLIPS INDUSTRIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

SHADI SABRINA L.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/6/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Complaint

1/6/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/9/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2024
  • Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2024
  • Hearing06/06/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/06/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to 05/08/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Isabel Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: R.A. Phillips Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Isabel Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: R.A. Phillips Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Isabel Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: R.A. Phillips Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Isabel Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: R.A. Phillips Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less