Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 21:08:20 (UTC).

ISABEL GARCIA PEREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS DEREK OKRENT, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 ISABEL GARCIA PEREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEREK OKRENT, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1863

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOZANO AN INDIVIDUAL HUMBERTO

REYES GUZMAN AN INDIVIDUAL NORMA

ITZEP HERRERA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

OLIVERA CRUZ AN INDIVIDUAL CELIA

TEOFILO LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA

GUZMAN VILLEGAS AN INDIVIDUAL SERAFINA

GONALEZ HERRERA AN INDIVIDUAL JUAN

REYES CRUZ AN INDIVIDUAL ERIN

PEREZ GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL EDGAR

GARCIA PUAC AN INDIVIDUAL BALDOMERO

GARCIA PEREZ AN INDIVIDUAL ISABEL

GONALEZ HERRERA JUAN

GARCIA PEREZ ISABEL

REYES GUZMAN NORMA

LOZANO HUMBERTO

LOPEZ MARIA TEOFILO

Defendants

OKRENT AN INDIVIDUAL DEREK

OKRENT AN INDIVIDUAL BAT SHEVA

OKRENT DEREK

OKRENT BAT SHEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBALEVICH DANIEL

FISHENFELD RACHEL

Defendant Attorney

ZYGELMAN CORINE

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/15/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/15/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OFF CALENDAR

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OFF CALENDAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

Answer

1/6/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTIES, DEFENDANTS, DEREK OKRENT AND BAT SHEVA OKRENT IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CCP 435.5

12/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTIES, DEFENDANTS, DEREK OKRENT AND BAT SHEVA OKRENT IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CCP 435.5

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

10/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/15/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: YADIRA

6/12/2020: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: YADIRA

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/16/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM LUIS

6/16/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM LUIS

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM YADIRA

6/10/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM YADIRA

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ROSEMARY

6/11/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ROSEMARY

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to be Relieved Off Calendar); Filed by Baldomero Garcia Puac (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Baldomero Garcia Puac (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Daniel Gibalevich (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Daniel Gibalevich (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 1:50 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Yadira Flores Garica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad litem re: Yadira)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Humberto Lozano (Plaintiff); Edgar Perez Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Humberto Lozano (Plaintiff); Edgar Perez Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Rosemary); Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Humberto Lozano (Plaintiff); Edgar Perez Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Yadira); Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Humberto Lozano (Plaintiff); Edgar Perez Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Luis); Filed by Isabel Garcia Perez (Plaintiff); Humberto Lozano (Plaintiff); Edgar Perez Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZYGELMAN CORINE