This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 00:08:25 (UTC).

ISABEL CRISTINA BOHORQUEZ VS WIKKED ENTERTAINMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 ISABEL CRISTINA BOHORQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WIKKED ENTERTAINMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8344

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BOHORQUEZ ISABEL CRISTINA

Respondents and Defendants

BULOCHNIKOV STELLA

WIKKED ENTERTAINMENT

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SIRMABEKIAN SAKO ESQ.

SIRMABEKIAN SARKIS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FREEDMAN BRYAN JOEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

8/20/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT

8/20/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/29/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

10/23/2018: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/7/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/3/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

12/18/2018: Case Management Order

Notice - Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

12/18/2018: Notice - Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

12/18/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF SARKIS SIRMABEKIAN IN SUPPORT OF; DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. FRE

4/10/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF SARKIS SIRMABEKIAN IN SUPPORT OF; DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. FRE

Notice - NOTICE PROOF OF PAYMENT TO THE LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

6/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE PROOF OF PAYMENT TO THE LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Request for Dismissal

10/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Non-Appearance Case Review (Plaintiff's Report re Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Isabel Cristina Bohorquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (PROOF OF PAYMENT TO THE LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY); Filed by Isabel Cristina Bohorquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF SARKIS SIRMABEKIAN IN SUPPORT OF; DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. FREEDMAN IN SUPPORT OF); Filed by Wikked Entertainment (Defendant); Stella Bulochnikov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wikked Entertainment (Defendant); Stella Bulochnikov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Wikked Entertainment (Defendant); Stella Bulochnikov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Isabel Cristina Bohorquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WIKKED ENTERTAINMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN BRYAN J. ESQ.