This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 07:12:21 (UTC).

ISAAC MUSIGHI, ET AL. VS SHAOUL J. LEVY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 ISAAC MUSIGHI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SHAOUL J LEVY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3871

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFIC M. INTERNATIONAL CORP DBA PMI DIAMONDS

MUSIGHI ISAAC

Defendants

LEVY SHAOUL J. DBA LEVY LAUTER LLP DBA SJ LEVY & COMPANY DBA LEVY & COMPANY

LEVY AFFILIATED HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN GLENN T.

Defendant Attorney

TULLY STEPHEN J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/8/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE

11/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shaoul J. Levy (Defendant); Levy Affiliated Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:29 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re response to complaint); Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff); Shaoul J. Levy (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Proofs of Service); Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Isaac Musighi (Plaintiff); Pacific M. International Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVY AFFILATED HOLDINGS. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN GLENN T.