This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 14:47:36 (UTC).

ISAAC DANIEL CAMPOS VS ANTONIO GUTIERREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 ISAAC DANIEL CAMPOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ANTONIO GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4133

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPOS ISAAC DANIEL

CAMPOS ISSAC DANIEL

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

GUTIERREZ ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IDREES KASIM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Issac Daniel Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Issac Daniel Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Issac Daniel Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Issac Daniel Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant