This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 04:02:34 (UTC).

ISAAC COLORADO AQUINO VS AABLE SECURITY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 ISAAC COLORADO AQUINO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AABLE SECURITY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1463

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLORADO AQUINO ISAAC

Defendant

AABLE SECURITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPHSON JACK DAVID

Defendant Attorney

JAYAKUMAR JEHAN N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/29/2020: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/29/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/8/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/29/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

4/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AABLE SECURITY, LLC Erroneously Sued As Aable Security, LLC a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (for Automatic Extension); Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AABLE SECURITY, LLC Erroneously Sued As Aable Security, LLC a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AABLE SECURITY, LLC Erroneously Sued As Aable Security, LLC a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AABLE SECURITY, LLC Erroneously Sued As Aable Security, LLC a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Isaac Colorado Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AABLE SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAYAKUMAR JEHAN N.