This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:06:29 (UTC).

IMRAN CHAUDHRY VS. LUIS CRUZ

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 IMRAN CHAUDHRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUIS CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6317

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAUDHRY IRMAN

CHAUDHRY IMRAN

Defendant

CRUZ LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMAHN COUNTS

Defendant Attorney

CHH LAW P.C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

3/16/2017: Summons

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

3/16/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Request For Copies

3/28/2017: Request For Copies

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

5/17/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

Case Management Statement

7/5/2017: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/6/2017: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/12/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-08-14 00:00:00

8/14/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-08-14 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-24 00:00:00

1/24/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-24 00:00:00

Substitution of Attorney

3/12/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-17 00:00:00

4/17/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-17 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-23 00:00:00

4/23/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-23 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-25 00:00:00

4/25/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-25 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

5/7/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-05-18 00:00:00

5/18/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-05-18 00:00:00

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2018
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Case Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Docketat 04:00 pm in Department NCGE, Other District Judge, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by LUIS CRUZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Docketat 04:00 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (VERIFICATION FILING NOTICE OFSETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E; (Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Trial - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by IMRAN CHAUDHRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less