This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 15:26:29 (UTC).

IRMA YOLANDA VELIZ MORALES VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 IRMA YOLANDA VELIZ MORALES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4819

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELIZ MORALES IRMA YOLANDA

Defendants

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

HIGA MATTHEW

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFII DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2024
  • Hearing09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irma Yolanda Veliz Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irma Yolanda Veliz Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irma Yolanda Veliz Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFII DANIEL JACOB