This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 05:57:21 (UTC).

IRMA SCHOT, ET AL. VS S&S LABOR FORCE INC.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 IRMA SCHOT, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against S S LABOR FORCE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1969

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHOT IRMA

TURNER EMMANUEL

Defendant

S&S LABOR FORCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYTON CHANTAL

Defendant Attorney

HONEY ROGER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSI...)

8/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSI...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/15/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

4/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

4/28/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/28/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Appearance

6/6/2022: Notice of Appearance

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/17/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Joint Status Conference Report

6/30/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

7/8/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/8/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

7/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Case Management Order

7/8/2022: Case Management Order

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/11/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/8/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Responsi...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Responsive Pleading scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to 08/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer To First Amended Complaint; Filed by: S&S Labor Force Inc. (Defendant); As to: Irma Schot (Plaintiff); Emmanuel Turner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Judicial Bulletin Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Filing and Service- Case Anywhere; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Responsive Pleading scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Emmanuel Turner (Plaintiff): Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Irma Schot (Plaintiff); Emmanuel M Turner (Plaintiff); As to: S&S Labor Force Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irma Schot (Plaintiff); Emmanuel M Turner (Plaintiff); As to: S&S Labor Force Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYTON CHANTAL