Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 07:12:08 (UTC).

IRMA OCHOA, ET AL. VS TURNER BOBBITT

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 IRMA OCHOA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TURNER BOBBITT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2366

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPUZANO MAYELI

OCHOA IRMA

FRIAS JESSICA

RAMIREZ JOSE L.

Defendants

BOBBITT TURNER

BOBBIT TURNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LLOREDA CARLOS

LLOREDA JR. CARLOS A.

Defendant Attorney

MOEST ROBERT C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Order

4/14/2021: Case Management Order

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4/14/2021: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Case Management Statement

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT DEFAULT REJECTED

1/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT DEFAULT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/3/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

1/4/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/10/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DANNY

11/17/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DANNY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Turner Bobbit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (Default Rejected); Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Turner Bobbit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Danny); Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irma Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jessica Frias (Plaintiff); Mayeli Campuzano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOEST ROBERT CHARLES