This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 05:29:55 (UTC).

IRMA NOEMI GUTIERREZ VS ROSS STORES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 IRMA NOEMI GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROSS STORES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6679

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ IRMA NOEMI

Defendants

ROSS STORES INC.

IBARRA RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANAH SETAREH

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/10/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irma Noemi Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irma Noemi Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irma Noemi Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ross Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANAH SETAREH ESQ