This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 17:23:13 (UTC).

IRMA MELENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 IRMA MELENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7894

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELENDEZ IRMA

TAVERES KATHY

Defendants

DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

VREEKE JIM

PARTNERS PERSONNEL- MANAGEMENT RESOURCES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GULESER ANN

Defendant Attorney

MCKELVEY ESQ BRANDON R

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY D...)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY D...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANN GULESER RE: OSC AS TO WHY DEFENDANT DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 583.

12/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANN GULESER RE: OSC AS TO WHY DEFENDANT DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 583.

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

10/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/26/2022

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/26/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/22/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/22/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Ruling

9/15/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

6/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANN GULESER

6/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANN GULESER

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2022

3/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2022

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2024
  • Hearing07/16/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/16/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 Day Estimate) scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: As To Why D...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 12/19/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: As To Why Defendant Decton Corporate Services, Inc. Should Not Be Dismissed On The Courts Own Motion Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Sections 583.410 and 583.420 scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 12/19/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF ANN GULESER RE: OSC AS TO WHY DEFENDANT DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 583.410, AND 583.4; Filed by: IRMA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff); KATHY TAVERES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/11/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: IRMA MELENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); KATHY TAVERES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); JIM VREEKE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: IRMA MELENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); KATHY TAVERES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); JIM VREEKE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: IRMA MELENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); KATHY TAVERES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: DECTON CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); JIM VREEKE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less