This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 07:45:42 (UTC).

IRMA DEL CASTILLO VS COMEX KC LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 IRMA DEL CASTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMEX KC LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4129

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTILLO IRMA DEL

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

COMEX KC LLC

THE KICKIN' CRAB

DOES 1 TO 100

PLAZA MEXICO

PLAMEX INVESTMENT LLC

MEXICO PLAZA

COMEX KC LLC DBA THE KICKIN' CRAB

PRIMETIME ENTERTAINMENT LLC

GLOBAL TREND PRODUCTIONS INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

COMEX KC LLC DBA THE KICKIN' CRAB

PRIMETIME ENTERTAINMENT LLC ROE 51

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DEMBICER DANIEL ESQ.

DEMBICER DANIEL MICHAH ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

SABAITIS FRANK T. ESQ.

SABAITIS FRANK THOMAS ESQ.

OLSON SONALI

LEVINE STEVEN DONALD

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE THAT MOTION FOR AN ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

12/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE THAT MOTION FOR AN ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...) OF 12/15/2020

12/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...) OF 12/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/19/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/19/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling

7/28/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DET...)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DET...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

7/24/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

3/3/2020: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE THAT MOTION FOR AN ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR); Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduled Hearing on Motion to be Relieved ...) of 12/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduled Hearing on Motion to be Relieved ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IRMA DEL CASTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4129    Hearing Date: February 02, 2021    Dept: 27

IRMA DEL CASTILLO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COMEX KC LLC, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

****4129

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

February 2, 2021

Daniel Dembicer’s Motion to be relieved as counsel was originally filed on August 19, 2020 and set for hearing on December 18, 2020.  On December 15, 2020, the Court issued a minute order rescheduling the Motion to February 2, 2021 and ordered the moving party to give notice of the new date.  There is no evidence that Plaintiff received notice of the new hearing date.  Accordingly, the motion to be relieved is DENIED without prejudice.  

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

2nd day of February 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****4129    Hearing Date: July 22, 2020    Dept: 27

IRMA DEL CASTILLO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COMEX KC, LLC,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

****4129

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

July 22, 2020

On November 17, 2017, plaintiff Irma Del Castillo filed this action against defendant Comex KC LLC dba The Kickin Crab (“Comex”) for premises liability.  Comex and Plaintiff now seek a determination of good faith settlement.  This Motion was originally set for hearing on April 8, 2020.  However, on April 16, 2020, the Court issued a minute order continuing the hearing first to May 18, 2020 and then to July 22, 2020.  The Court ordered the moving party to give notice, but no notice of continuance has been filed and there is no evidence that the parties have received notice of the continued hearing date.  

Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice.  

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

22ndday ofJuly2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEXICO PLAZA is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIMETIME ENTERTAINMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBAL TREND PRODUCTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAZA MEXICO is a litigant