Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 03:59:59 (UTC).

IRIS HERNANDEZ VS ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 IRIS HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1228

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ IRIS

Defendants and Respondents

ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/16/2018: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/16/2018: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order

12/21/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/21/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/8/2019: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Answer

12/7/2017: Answer

Other -

12/7/2017: Other -

Declaration

12/7/2017: Declaration

SUMMONS

10/25/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

10/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 03/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Status Conference Report; Filed by ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by IRIS HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Order (Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • Answer; Filed by ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Declaration Declaration of Trial Attorney Michael Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial by SFMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by IRIS HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by IRIS HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC681228    Hearing Date: November 18, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

IRIS HERNANDEZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC681228

Hearing Date: November 18, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to dismiss

Plaintiff Iris Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action after she slipped and fell at a hospital owned and operated by Defendant St. Francis Medical Center (“Defendant”). Defendant filed for bankruptcy on August 31, 2018, and the Bankruptcy Court issued an order creating a liquidation plan. Now, Defendant moves to dismiss this case because Plaintiff failed to file a proof of claim with the Bankruptcy Court. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, which is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion is granted. The Court dismisses Defendant from this case. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause why the Doe Defendants should not be dismissed for December 20, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Defendant’s counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 18, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC681228    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

iris hernandez,

Plaintiff,

v.

saint frances medical center, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC681228

Hearing Date: September 28, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Plaintiff’s counsel, David Azizi (“Counsel”), moves to be relieved as counsel. Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) Counsel states that there has been a break down in the attorney client relationship. This is a valid basis for the motion. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of a proof of service of a signed copy of the order on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files with the court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must to serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days.

Counsel is ordered to provide notice of this order, and file proof of service of such.

DATED: September 28, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC681228    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: 32

Order #1 of 2

IRIS HERNANDEZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC681228

Hearing Date: September 2, 2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AND DISMISSAL

ORDER SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

The Court continues the Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions and Dismissal. The Court also sets an Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal due to Bankruptcy or, in the alternative, a Trial Setting Conference. Both shall be held on September 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff’s counsel, David Azizi, shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: August 28, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Order #2 of 2

,

Plaintiff,

v.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC681228 

Hearing Date: September 2, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney David Azizi (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Iris Hernandez (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052. However, Counsel did not lodge with the Court a correct copy of the proposed order on form MC-053. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The first page is from Form MC-053 and the second page is from Form MC-052.

The Court continues the hearing on this motion to September 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders Counsel to prepare and lodge a correct version of the proposed order on form MC-053. Counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court. If Counsel fails to do so, the Court will deny this motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.