This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 20:15:21 (UTC).

IRIS BERRY VS LISA JACOBSEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 IRIS BERRY filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against LISA JACOBSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6813

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERRY IRIS

Defendants

HARVEST HOUSE

JACOBSEN LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYMAN ANDREW C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

JENKINS ESQ MICHAEL

HALL ANN

JENKINS MICHAEL E

CHIDI ELIZABETH MKPAYAH

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/21/2021: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

8/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/24/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

11/22/2021: Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney

12/28/2021: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

3/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability of Counsel); Filed by LISA JACOBSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by LISA JACOBSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Michael Jenkins,Esq (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by LISA JACOBSEN (Defendant); HARVEST HOUSE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LISA JACOBSEN (Defendant); HARVEST HOUSE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LISA JACOBSEN (Defendant); HARVEST HOUSE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by IRIS BERRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by IRIS BERRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IRIS BERRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by IRIS BERRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IRIS BERRY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS MICHAEL EDWIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS ESQ MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIDI ELIZABETH MKPAYAH