This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 19:25:32 (UTC).

IRINA RUSANOVSKAYA, ET AL. VS LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 IRINA RUSANOVSKAYA, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6024

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUSANOVSKAYA IRINA

RUSANOVSKIY SERGEY

Defendants

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

PRESSLER STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN J.

Defendant Attorney

BOJORQUEZ CHRISTIAN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/11/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

1/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING SITPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/17/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING SITPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PERSONNEL RECORDS AND FID REPORT

6/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PERSONNEL RECORDS AND FID REPORT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff); Sergey Rusanovskiy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PERSONNEL RECORDS AND FID REPORT; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (Sitpulation for Protective Order; Stipulation for Protective Order); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff); Sergey Rusanovskiy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff); Sergey Rusanovskiy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff); Sergey Rusanovskiy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irina Rusanovskaya (Plaintiff); Sergey Rusanovskiy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******6024 Hearing Date: December 1, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

IRINA RUSANOVSKAYA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT,

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: *******6024

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

DEPARTMENT 31 OF THE PERSONAL INJURY (PI) COURT HAS DETERMINED THAT THE ABOVE ENTITLED ACTION IS:

Complicated based upon either the number of pretrial hearings or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1, THIS CASE IS HEREBY:

Transferred and reassigned to the Northwest District, Dept. W. All future proceedings will be before a judge selected by the Supervising Judge in that District. The parties who have appeared in the case will receive a Notice of Case Reassignment to an Independent Calendar (IC) court for all purposes from the Van Nuys courthouse.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned IC court.

COUNSEL ARE TO NOTE THAT EVEN IF THE CASE SUMMARY STILLS SHOWS DEPARTMENT 31 WITH FUTURE HEARINGS, COUNSEL ARE TO CONSIDER THEM TO BE OFF CALENDAR UNTIL RESET IN THE NEW DEPARTMENT ASSIGNED EITHER BY THE COURT STAFF OR THROUGH THE COURT’S RESERVATION SYSTEM BY MOVING PARTY.

Dated this ____ day of December 2021

Hon Audra Mori

Judge of the Superior Court

'


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOJORQUEZ CHRISTIAN RICHARD