This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 05:33:45 (UTC).

IRINA IBRANHIMOVA VS LYNN M WARD

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 IRINA IBRANHIMOVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYNN M WARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7789

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBRANHIMOVA IRINA

Defendant

WARD LYNN M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KRUGER JACKIE ROSE

Defendant Attorney

SHRAIBATI MALEK H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/12/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/14/2019: Unknown

Answer

1/7/2019: Answer

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/11/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Answer/Response by Defendant or Request for Entry of Default) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Answer/Response by Defendant or Reque...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Lynn M. Ward (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lynn M. Ward (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irina Ibranhimova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irina Ibranhimova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7789    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 2

Ibrahimova v. Ward

The Motion to Compel Further Responses to Set One of Plaintiff Irina Ibrahimova’s Request for Admission to Defendant Lynn M. Ward is DENIED. Plaintiff has not complied with the procedural requirements for such a motion and has not shown entitlement to relief. Among other things, Plaintiff has not scheduled an informal discovery conference, as required by the general order that applies to personal injury cases for motions to compel further responses; has not filed or served a memorandum of points and authorities or any evidence in support of the motion; and has not filed a separate statement. The Court notes that there are several other motions on calendar in the coming weeks that appear to suffer from the same deficiencies. Counsel is admonished that the motions should be taken off calendar or the hearing dates continued immediately or sanctions will be imposed for misuse of the discovery process.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHRAIBATI MALEK H