This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:14:22 (UTC).

IRINA FELDMAN VS. 8500 BURTON WAY, LLC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 IRINA FELDMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 8500 BURTON WAY, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5536

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELDMAN IRINA

Defendants

KIMBALL TYREE & ST. JOHN LLP

8500 BURTON WAY LLC

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDONA-LOYA OCTAVIO II

Defendant Attorneys

KRISTOVICH THERESA A.

KELLY ADRIENNE R

LANDERS THOMAS F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department W; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing On Demurrer; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department W; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Irina Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Notice-Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice-Ruling; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by 8500 Burton Way, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • Answer (KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Kimball, Tyree, & St. John, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Stipulation-Order (TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Stipulation-Order; Filed by Kimball, Tyree, & St. John, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Irina Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Irina Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Irina Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8500 Burton Way, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARDONA-LOYA II, OCTAVIO