Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 20:57:27 (UTC).

IRENE OLIVIA SPRAGUE, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI VS GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IRENE OLIVIA SPRAGUE, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI filed an Other lawsuit against GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6905

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRAGUE BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI IRENE OLIVIA

Defendants

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MCKENNA ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY PLAINITFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION

6/7/2021: Reply - REPLY PLAINITFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION

Notice of Related Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH/LIMIT

6/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH/LIMIT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

6/22/2021: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, OFF CALENDAR

6/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, OFF CALENDAR

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUE

6/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUE

Separate Statement

6/1/2021: Separate Statement

Motion for Protective Order

4/30/2021: Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order

4/30/2021: Motion for Protective Order

Separate Statement

4/26/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLANITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE

4/26/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLANITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE

Separate Statement

4/26/2021: Separate Statement

Demand for Jury Trial

4/5/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

2/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion for Protective Order regarding Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Off calendar); Filed by Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant); Adventist Health System/West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO quash/limit); Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (notice of case management conference); Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TERESA FIELDS FAGIANI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST); Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irene Olivia Sprague, by and through her successor in interest, Teresa Fields Fagiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL