This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 03:57:04 (UTC).

IRENE LAGUNAS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 IRENE LAGUNAS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0230

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAGUNAS AN INDIVIDUAL IRENE

Defendants

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA

DOE AN INDIVIDUAL KENNY

DOES 2 THROUGH 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

URBAN ALEKSANDRA

Defendant Attorney

MACMILLAN JOANNA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME. 2. INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENTS. 3. FAILURE TO PAY FOR REST PERIODS NOT PROVIDED. 4. FAILURE TO PAY FOR MEAL PERIODS NOT PROVIDED...

1/26/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME. 2. INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENTS. 3. FAILURE TO PAY FOR REST PERIODS NOT PROVIDED. 4. FAILURE TO PAY FOR MEAL PERIODS NOT PROVIDED...

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/31/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

3/28/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/31/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 05/26/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Irene Lagunas, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Irene Lagunas, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irene Lagunas, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Irene Lagunas, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA a California corporation (Defendant); Kenny DOE, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME. 2. INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENTS. 3. FAILURE TO PAY FOR REST PERIODS NOT PROVIDED. 4. FAILURE TO PAY FOR MEAL PERIODS NOT PROVIDED... Filed by: Irene Lagunas, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY DBA NORTH ITALIA a California corporation (Defendant); Kenny DOE, an individual (Defendant); DOES 2 through 25 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less