Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 10:23:49 (UTC).

IRENE KADOTA, TRUSTEE OF THE GUADALUPE AND IRENE NUNEZ TRUST VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 IRENE KADOTA, TRUSTEE OF THE GUADALUPE AND IRENE NUNEZ TRUST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5060

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRENE KADOTA TRUSTEE OF THE GUADALUPE AND IRENE NUNEZ TRUST

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER RICHARD T

Defendant Attorney

SANDERS JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL

4/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL

Answer

3/25/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/2/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Final Status Conference and Non-Jury Trial); Filed by Irene Kadota, trustee of the Guadalupe and Irene Nunez Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irene Kadota, trustee of the Guadalupe and Irene Nunez Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irene Kadota, trustee of the Guadalupe and Irene Nunez Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irene Kadota, trustee of the Guadalupe and Irene Nunez Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irene Kadota, trustee of the Guadalupe and Irene Nunez Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T