This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 06:44:41 (UTC).

IRENE CORONA GAONA VS BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 IRENE CORONA GAONA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7596

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAONA IRENE CORONA

Defendants

DOWNEY CITY OF

MIRANDA SANTIAGO

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

MAURICIO MOREIRA TRUCKING

ODYSSEY LOGISTICS&TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

BURLINGTON NORTHERN SANTA FE CORPORATION

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

BELL CITY OF

MOREIRA MAURICIO

COMMERCE CITY OF

STEEL WHEEL TRUCKING INC.

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

LOGISTICS CMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BALABAN & SPIELBERGER LLP

LAW KHATIBI

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE PER SE ;ETC

12/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE PER SE ;ETC

SUMMONS

12/21/2017: SUMMONS

Amended Complaint

12/21/2017: Amended Complaint

SUMMONS

1/22/2018: SUMMONS

Request for Dismissal

1/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING TEMPORARY STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS

7/31/2018: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING TEMPORARY STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Settlement

7/25/2018: Notice of Settlement

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4/19/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4/19/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/19/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/19/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND

2/23/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING TEMPORARY STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketExParte Application & Order; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) first

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irene Corona Gaona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE PER SE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where BELL CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNEY CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant