Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 15:43:12 (UTC).

IRENA RASKIN VS BREA SOLOMON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 IRENA RASKIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BREA SOLOMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7239

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASKIN IRENA

Defendants

SOLOMON BREA

SOLOMON DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVAK SEAN M ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

OGUNNUBI MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/23/2021: Answer

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brea Solomon (Defendant); David Solomon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Brea Solomon (Defendant); David Solomon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irena Raskin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Irena Raskin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irena Raskin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irena Raskin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irena Raskin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVAK SEAN M