This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 23:07:46 (UTC).

IRELAND TINOCO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS IRIS SINGH KALEKA, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 IRELAND TINOCO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRIS SINGH KALEKA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6279

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINOCO AN INDIVIDUAL IRELAND

Defendant

KALEKA AN INDIVIDUAL IRIS SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHKOLNIKNOV EDWARD ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KORFF EVE HELENE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/2/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2024
  • Hearing07/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by IRIS SINGH KALEKA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by IRIS SINGH KALEKA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IRELAND TINOCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by IRELAND TINOCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IRELAND TINOCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHKOLNIKOV ESQ, EDWARD