This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 11:48:56 (UTC).

IRANI, BABAK BOBBY VS ARBAB, SHAHRZAD

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 IRANI, BABAK BOBBY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARBAB, SHAHRZAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0769

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IRANI BABAK BOBBY

Respondent

ARBAB SHAHRZAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MILES JOY WREN

MILES JOY KRAFT

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/26/2021: Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Separate Property

5/26/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/26/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/26/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

5/26/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 06/19/21

6/24/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 06/19/21

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition - Served 06/19/21

6/24/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition - Served 06/19/21

Request - Enter Default FL165

7/29/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/12/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition (Served 06/19/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 06/19/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY WREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY KRAFT