Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 12:05:52 (UTC).

IRAEL MELGAR VS JOSE ROBERTO ROMERO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 IRAEL MELGAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOSE ROBERTO ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4542

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELGAR IRAEL

Defendants

ROMERO REYNA

ROMERO JOSE ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN LOREN

Defendant Attorney

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/24/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Hearing07/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Roberto Romero (Defendant); Reyna Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Roberto Romero (Defendant); Reyna Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Irael Melgar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Irael Melgar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Irael Melgar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Irael Melgar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Irael Melgar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN LOREN BENNETT