This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:38:14 (UTC).

IRA LEE KIMBLE VS. WDW JOINT VENTURE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 IRA LEE KIMBLE filed an Other lawsuit against WDW JOINT VENTURE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, TORRIBIO, JOHN A., BRIAN F. GASDIA and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6607

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Appellants

KIMBLE IRA LEE BY AND THROUGH HIS

KIMBLE LORETTA G.

KIMBLE HELENA

KIMBLE IRA LEE

KIMBLE II IRA

KIMBLE LATRICIA R.

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

WDW JOINT VENTURE DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY

HELENA KIMBLE

WDW JOINT VENTURE DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER

MORRIS WEISS & STANLEY DILLER PARTNERSHIP

W D W JOINT VENTURE DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY

KIMBLE HELENA

GIBSON SABRINA

GIBSON MONTORIA

Defendant and Respondent

WDW JOINT VENTURE DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY DBA DOWNEY COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER

Not Classified By Court

SABRINA GIBSON & MONTORIA GIBSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA ARTIGLIERE & MEDBY

APOLLO ADAM MICHAEL

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL ESQ.

GUSTIN MATTHEW JOLE

Defendant Attorneys

PLEISS CASEY SITAR & ROSS

PLEISS SITAR MCGRATH HUNTER & HALLACK

A.O.E. LAW & ASSOCIATES INC.

EGBASE ANTHONY OBEHI

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/8/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

5/16/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

6/8/2018: Unknown

Motion in Limine

1/9/2019: Motion in Limine

Objection

1/10/2019: Objection

Objection

1/10/2019: Objection

Reply

1/10/2019: Reply

Motion in Limine

1/22/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

1/22/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion for Reconsideration

3/6/2019: Motion for Reconsideration

Unknown

4/4/2019: Unknown

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/12/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice

4/29/2019: Notice

Unknown

5/16/2019: Unknown

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/29/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Judicial Notice

8/14/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice of Posting Fees with the Court Reporter (Waiver of Deposit); Filed by HELENA KIMBLE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by WDW JOINT VENTURE dba DOWNEY COMMUNITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding dismissal of VC066607-settled case) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Status Conference (as to defendants Montoria Gibson and Sabrina) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference as to defendants ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Motion to Join Necessary Party; Filed by Ira Lee Kimble (Plaintiff); HELENA KIMBLE (Defendant); MORRIS WEISS & STANLEY DILLER PARTNERSHIP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice (of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint - Amended); Filed by HELENA KIMBLE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
376 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by KIMBLE, IRA LEE, by and through his (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Declaration (OF LORETTA G. KIMBLE AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO IRA LEE KIMBLE PURSUANT TO CCP 337.32 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by KIMBLE, IRA LEE, by and through his (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (ON THE 3-14-18 HEARING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC066607    Hearing Date: September 29, 2020    Dept: C

KIMBLE, et al. v. WDW JOINT VENTURE, et al.

CASE NO.:  VC066607 (Lead Case; Consolidated with VC066608)

HEARING 9/29/20

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#13

TENTATIVE ORDER

Nominal Defendants Sabrana and Motoriah Gipson’s demurrer is DENIED.

Moving parties to give NOTICE.

Nominal Defendants Sabrana and Motoriah Gipson demurs to the Complaint because they are not “nominal Defendants,” but instead, should be joined as Plaintiffs.

The court finds that a demurrer is not the proper vehicle to make this request. Nominal Defendants are ordered to file a properly noticed motion to join the action as Plaintiffs.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APOLLO ADAM MICHAEL