Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:23:02 (UTC).

INTO BO CHAMPON VS ROY AL PHOENIX CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 INTO BO CHAMPON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROY AL PHOENIX CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9015

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHAMPON INTO BO

Defendants and Respondents

DAM FUONG DAVE

THAM ALLAN

ROYAL PHOENIX CONSTRUCTION INC.

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YEE WILLIAM S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DUNHAM DONALD ESQ.

AINSLIE ADAM A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY AND DUTY TO DEFEND; ETC.

4/27/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY AND DUTY TO DEFEND; ETC.

Unknown

4/30/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

6/22/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/22/2018: Unknown

Status Report

10/10/2018: Status Report

Unknown

10/23/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

12/24/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

1/2/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/14/2017: Minute Order

COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. MISREPRESENTATION

7/19/2017: COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. MISREPRESENTATION

SUMMONS

7/19/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by Into Bo Champon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 21; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice (Of OSC Off Calendar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • at 2:33 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/23/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Into Bo Champon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Into Bo Champon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. MISREPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AINSLIE ADAM ANTHONY