This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:16:50 (UTC).

INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. VS DANNY ROCKETT, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANNY ROCKETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7362

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

IRON HORSE CONTRUCTION

ROCKETT DANNY AN INDIVIDUAL

IRON HORSE CONSTRUCTION INC.

ROCKETT DANNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEARNS LOUIS A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/20/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/11/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

2/26/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER

5/2/2018: STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

6/5/2018: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

DEFAULT PROVE UP

6/5/2018: DEFAULT PROVE UP

DEFAULT PROVE UP EXHIBITS

6/5/2018: DEFAULT PROVE UP EXHIBITS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/5/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

6/11/2018: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

NOTICE OF REJECTION

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2ND NOTICE OF REJECTIONS

9/15/2017: 2ND NOTICE OF REJECTIONS

NOTICE OF REJECTION-SUMMONS

9/7/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION-SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

9/7/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

9/7/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DEFAULT PROVE UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • 2ND NOTICE OF REJECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION-SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by INTERTEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.