This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 11:57:30 (UTC).

INTERPOOL, INC. VS WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 INTERPOOL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0106

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERPOOL INC. DBA TRAC INTERMODAL

Defendant

WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO

Defendant Attorney

TAM MARIA W.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

5/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Order - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

5/20/2021: Order - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

2/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE)

Notice - NOTICE OF: 1) RESULTS OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 2) CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND 3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

2/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF: 1) RESULTS OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 2) CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND 3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

3/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; C...)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...) OF 01/13/2021

1/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...) OF 01/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/4/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (Dismissing Action Without Prejudice with the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation of All Parties to Dismiss Action Without Prejudice With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce the Settlement Pursuant to CCP 664.6; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...) of 01/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Winsfargo Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Interpool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERPOOL INC. DBA TRAC INTERMODAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAM MARIA W