This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 19:21:16 (UTC).

INTERPOOL, INC. DBA TRAC INTERMODAL VS A&E HARBOR TRANSPORT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 INTERPOOL, INC DBA TRAC INTERMODAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A E HARBOR TRANSPORT INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0854

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERPOOL INC. DBA TRAC INTERMODAL

Defendants

A&E HARBOR TRANSPORT INC.

RAMIREZ ELISEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

Defendant Attorney

NATHAN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/23/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Denial

2/25/2022: General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by A&E Harbor Transport Inc. (Defendant); Eliseo Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interpool, Inc. dba Trac Intermodal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Interpool, Inc. dba Trac Intermodal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interpool, Inc. dba Trac Intermodal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&E HARBOR TRANSPORT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERPOOL INC. DBA TRAC INTERMODAL is a litigant