This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 19:32:07 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL MARMOL, INC. VS GINI PROPERTIES IV LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 INTERNATIONAL MARMOL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GINI PROPERTIES IV LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1938

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERNATIONAL MARMOL INC.

Defendants

GINI PROPERTIES IV LLC

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

MATHIASON JEREMY

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MEAGLIA RICHARD

SINCLAIR KEVIN S.

STEINBERG ANDREW H.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/19/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Answer

3/8/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gini Properties IV LLC (Defendant); Jeremy Mathiason (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by International Marmol, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by International Marmol, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by International Marmol, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by International Marmol, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant