This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 08:42:50 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS ALEJANDRO CARDOSO

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEJANDRO CARDOSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7068

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

CARDOSO ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN DEBORAH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH