This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 10:09:10 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS JOHN PAUL BRADLEY III

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN PAUL BRADLEY III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6961

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

BRADLEY III JOHN PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN DEBORAH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH