Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 13:52:15 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS DANIELLE HAUNANI WINTERHOLLER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIELLE HAUNANI WINTERHOLLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7647

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

WINTERHOLLER DANIELLE HAUNANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCCLAIN DEBORAH L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/15/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE