Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 18:30:57 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS MARIA DE JESUS MARISCALRIOS

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA DE JESUS MARISCALRIOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9526

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendant

DE JESUS MARISCALRIOS MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less