This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 12:25:56 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS ALEX TANJALA

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEX TANJALA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0787

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendants and Respondents

TANJALA ALEX

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/18/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

5/10/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

5/10/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT- BY COURT

12/26/2017: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT- BY COURT

DECLARATION OF DEBRA. BERNARD IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.CP.585(D) & C.C.P. ?.1033]

12/26/2017: DECLARATION OF DEBRA. BERNARD IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.CP.585(D) & C.C.P. ?.1033]

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGEMENT

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT- BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.C.P. 585(D) & C.C.P. 1033]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DEBRA. BERNARD IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.CP.585(D) & C.C.P. .1033]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0787    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB, etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ALEX TANJALA, et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: ****0787

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Date: February 5, 2020

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Alex Tanjala

The Court has considered the moving papers. No opposition papers were filed. No courtesy copies of any opposition papers were provided to the Court.

BACKGROUND

Plaintiff’s complaint arises from Defendant allegedly rear-ending the insured of Plaintiff. Plaintiff filed a complaint against Defendants alleging causes of action for: (1) subrogation claim; and (2) indebtedness.

On July 18, 2017, Plaintiff requested the entry of default with respect to Defendant and default was entered against Defendant thereto. On December 26, 2017, the Court entered default judgment against Defendant.

Defendant filed a motion for the Court to set aside the default entered against him on July 18, 2017, and the subsequent default judgment entered against him on December 26, 2017. Defendant’s motion is made on the grounds that: (1) service did not result in actual notice because he was not actually served with the summons and complaint; and (2) he has established that it was not avoidance or service or inexcusable neglect that caused him not to receive actual notice.

Due to Defendant’s motion being unopposed, the Court GRANTS Defendant’s motion to set aside the entry of default and default judgment entered against him. (Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 5th day of February 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****0787    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ALEX TANJALA,

Defendant.

CASE NO.: ****0787

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: March 11, 2020

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Robin E. Paley, Esq.

Robin E. Paley seeks to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Alex Tanjala. Counsel’s motion is compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.

In connection with the motion to be relieved as counsel, Robin E. Paley declares that: (1) the client is avoiding communication with attorney; and (2) there are unresolved issues with client regarding fees and costs.

The Court has discretion on whether to allow an attorney to withdraw, and a motion to withdraw will not be granted where withdrawal would prejudice the client. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

In light of the facts above, the Court GRANTS Robin E. Paley’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Alex Tanjala.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 11th day of March 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL