Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 23:24:49 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DANNY JONES

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against DANNY JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0273

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondent

JONES DANNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLMAN JONATHAN HILLEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

2/16/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - FOR CASE NUMBER

1/29/2021: Petition - FOR CASE NUMBER

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

2/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Reservation and filing of Notice of hearing on Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketfor case number; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN JONATHAN