This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2020 at 07:05:31 (UTC).

INTEGRITY REBAR PLACERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS STEVE P. RADOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 INTEGRITY REBAR PLACERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVE P RADOS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0331

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTEGRITY REBAR PLACERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

STEVE P. RADOS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADYCH JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/22/2020: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/30/2020: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Integrity Rebar Placers, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Integrity Rebar Placers, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Integrity Rebar Placers, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Integrity Rebar Placers, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Integrity Rebar Placers, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVE P. RADOS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLADYCH ESQ, JOHN A.