This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 09:41:09 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS RONNIE ABUD

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RONNIE ABUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3009

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

ABUD RONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK PETER VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/7/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/7/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2024
  • Hearing04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff); As to: Ronnie Abud (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff); As to: Ronnie Abud (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff); As to: Ronnie Abud (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less