This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 00:31:13 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS GARY KOCH

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARY KOCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6552

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

KOCH GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK PETER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK PETER